This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/03/2023 at 12:09:01 (UTC).

2 G PROPERTIES VS JARVIS VAIL

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 2 G PROPERTIES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JARVIS VAIL. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-20

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2 G PROPERTIES

Defendant

VAIL, JARVIS

Not Classified By Court

EVICTION PROPERTY ADDRESS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/02/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

12/02/2022 - Complaint

Service Returned

12/14/2022 - Service Returned

Affidavit as to Costs

12/14/2022 - Affidavit as to Costs

Default

12/15/2022 - Default

Default Final Judgment

12/22/2022 - Default Final Judgment

Writ of Possession Issued - No Sheriff Fee

12/22/2022 - Writ of Possession Issued - No Sheriff Fee

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Issued - No Sheriff Fee; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: VAIL JARVIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 33516:4421; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: VAIL JARVIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: VAIL JARVIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event; Comments: NON-PAYMENT OF RENT, NON MILITARY AFF. & MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: VAIL JARVIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2560002AMT PAID:$195.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.002139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CASHTENDER AMT:$200.00TENDER TYPE:CHANGETENDER AMT:($5.00)RECEIPT DATE:12/02/2022REGISTER#:256CASHIER:KWILLI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: VAIL JARVIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Hialeah; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EVICTION PROPERTY ADDRESS is a litigant