This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/02/2022 at 12:22:58 (UTC).

1ST RESPONSE REHAB CENTER INC VS TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 1ST RESPONSE REHAB CENTER INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1ST RESPONSE REHAB CENTER INC

Assignor

Mojica, Janisty

Defendant

TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John C Daly

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/19/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/19/2022 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/20/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/20/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Request for Production

02/03/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

02/03/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

02/03/2022 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Filing:

02/03/2022 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing Deposition

02/03/2022 - Notice of Filing Deposition

Voluntary Dismissal

03/24/2022 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33095:239; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100205AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:JOHN C DALY1380 N. UNIVERSITY DRIVE, SUITE 200PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/21/2022REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100008AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:JOHN C DALY1380 N. UNIVERSITY DRIVE, SUITE 200PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:01/21/2022REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 3. Parties: TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 1st Response Rehab Center is a litigant

Latest cases where TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daly, John C, Jr.