This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 12/05/2021 at 04:52:53 (UTC).

1600 COLLINS AVENUE, LLC VS DRYBAR HOLDINGS LLC

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 1600 COLLINS AVENUE, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DRYBAR HOLDINGS LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1600 Collins Avenue, LLC

Defendant

Drybar Holdings LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pena, Kelly A, ESQ

Defendant Attorney

Mason, W Scott

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

05/04/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

05/04/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Hearing-

04/14/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Hearing-

04/14/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Set Aside Default

04/12/2021 - Motion to Set Aside Default

Motion for Extension of Time

04/12/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Default Judgment

04/12/2021 - Motion for Default Judgment

Notice of Appearance

04/09/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Default

04/05/2021 - Default

Motion for Default

04/02/2021 - Motion for Default

Service Returned

04/01/2021 - Service Returned

Complaint

03/11/2021 - Complaint

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/18/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/17/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/11/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/16/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/16/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/12/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32488:4217; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Drybar Holdings LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: HEARING SET FOR 5/6/21 AT 9:00 A.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: THURSDAY MAY 6, 2021 AT 9:00 A.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Set Aside Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Mason W Scott; Drybar Holdings LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default Judgment; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Mason W Scott; Drybar Holdings LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Drybar Holdings LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Drybar Holdings LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Drybar Holdings LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2560108AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:SALINAS, ALEXANDER A., ESQFRIEDMAN & FROST, P.L. 1111 BRICKELL AVENUE SUITEMIAMI FL 33131COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:03/16/2021REGISTER#:256CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2540016AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:SALINAS, ALEXANDER A., ESQFRIEDMAN & FROST, P.L. 1111 BRICKELL AVENUE SUITEMIAMI FL 33131COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:03/13/2021REGISTER#:254CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 1600 Collins Avenue, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Drybar Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mason, W Scott