This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/09/2020 at 01:41:05 (UTC).

11601 BISCAYNE (LLC) VS. ALGARCHI INC

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 11601 BISCAYNE LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALGARCHI INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

11601 Biscayne (LLC)

Defendant

Algarchi Inc

Not Classified By Court

Algarchi, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Segal, Jonathan W

 

Court Documents

Default

03/05/2020 - Default

Notice:

02/28/2020 - Notice:

Motion for Default

02/28/2020 - Motion for Default

Affidavit of Proof(claim)

02/28/2020 - Affidavit of Proof(claim)

Affidavit as to Costs

02/28/2020 - Affidavit as to Costs

Service Returned

02/23/2020 - Service Returned

Complaint

02/14/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Algarchi Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFAULT TO BE ENTERED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Proof(claim); Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Sp Certified Mail Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Algarchi Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Algarchi Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2570010AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/18/2020 REGISTER#:257CASHIER:MONICAA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3460033AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:SEGAL, JONATHAN W 200 S BISCAYNE BLVD STE 3200 MIAMI FL 33131-5323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less