This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/17/2021 at 06:10:02 (UTC).

101 HOMES REALTY LLC VS ROSA JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 101 HOMES REALTY LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROSA JOHNSON. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-20

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

101 HOMES REALTY LLC

Defendant

JOHNSON, ROSA

Not Classified By Court

EVICTION PROPERTY ADDRESS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kaye-Ann M Baxter

 

Court Documents

Default Final Judgment

10/04/2021 - Default Final Judgment

Default

09/29/2021 - Default

Motion for Default Judgment

09/28/2021 - Motion for Default Judgment

Motion for Default

09/28/2021 - Motion for Default

Service Returned

09/28/2021 - Service Returned

Non-Military Affidavit

09/20/2021 - Non-Military Affidavit

Complaint

09/16/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/16/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 32778:3973; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: JOHNSON ROSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: JOHNSON ROSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: JOHNSON ROSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: JOHNSON ROSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2410004AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:MASTER CARDTENDER AMT:$30.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/20/2021 REGISTER#:241CASHIER:KAYLAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100072AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:KAYE-ANN M BAXTER 5220 S UNIVERSITY DR STE C-110 FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33328-5317 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/18/2021 REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EVICTION PROPERTY ADDRESS is a litigant

Latest cases where 101 Homes Realty LLC is a litigant