This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/25/2019 at 00:40:32 (UTC).

POLASHENSKI, WILLIAM J VS AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP

Case Summary

On 03/27/2003 POLASHENSKI, WILLIAM J filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POLASHENSKI, WILLIAM J

Defendants

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP

VENTIS CROPSCIENCE U S A INC

A W CHESTERTON CO

BIGHAM INSULATION & SUPPLY CO

BIRD INC

CERTAINTEED CORP

C E THURSTON & SONS INC

CLEAVER BROOKS INC

CONGOLEUM CORP

CROWN CORK & SEAL CO INC

DANA CORP

DURO DYNE CORP

EASTERN REFRACTORIES CO INC

EAFCO INC

ERICCSON INC

EXXONMOBIL OIL CORP

FLINTKOTE CO THE

FLOWSERVE CORP

WHEELER, FOSTER

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAGOLINZER, DAVID

Ferraro & Assoc. #700 4000 Ponce De Leon Blvd

Miami, F1 33146

Defendant Attorneys

KIBBE, REBECCA C

CLARK, TIMOTHY

Santangelo, Carolina

ROBERT V FITZSIMMONS

Suite A-145 9485 Sunset Drive

Miami, FL 33173

FITZSIMMONS, ROBERT V.

Other Attorneys

VIRGINIA EASLEY JOHNSON

Foley & Mansfield P L L P 4770 Bisc Blvd - #1030

Miami, FL 33137

MARTIN B UNGER

701 Peachtree Road

Orlando, FL 32804

SMITH, MELVILLE S

COLLINGS, CHRISTOPHER JAMES MORE

2 South Biscayne Blvdsuite 1500

Miami, FL 33131

Johnson, Virginia Easley

Stella Chu (esq)

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing:

05/04/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/30/2015 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Affidavit of:

04/28/2015 - Affidavit of:

Affidavit of:

04/28/2015 - Affidavit of:

Voluntary Dismissal

04/24/2015 - Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/23/2015 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/22/2015 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/22/2015 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice:

04/22/2015 - Notice:

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/20/2015 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice:

04/10/2015 - Notice:

Notice of Appearance

04/07/2015 - Notice of Appearance

Order Setting the Initial Case Management Conference

04/01/2015 - Order Setting the Initial Case Management Conference

Notice of Appearance

03/31/2015 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Trial (case at Issue)

02/26/2015 - Notice of Trial (case at Issue)

FWOP Notice

02/12/2015 - FWOP Notice

Voluntary Dismissal

03/22/2007 - Voluntary Dismissal

Recorded Document

06/27/2005 - Recorded Document

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 29659:4898; Event Type: Event; Comments: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Parties: Collings Christopher James More; Smith Melville S; Martin B Unger; Fitzsimmons Robert V.; Johnson Virginia Easley; American Optical Corp; Ventis Cropscience U S A Inc; A W Chesterton Co; Bigham Insulation & Supply Co; Bird Inc; Certainteed Corp; C E Thurston & Sons Inc; Cleaver Brooks Inc; Congoleum Corp; Eastern Refractories Co Inc; Eafco Inc; Exxonmobil Oil Corp; Flintkote Co (the); Flowserve Corp; Wheeler Foster; Garlock Sealing Technology; Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co (the); H B Smith Co Inc; Hobart Brothers Co; John Crane Inc; Kelly Moore Paint Co; Lake Asbestos Of Quebec Ltd; Lincoln Electric Co; Metropolitan Life Ins Co; National Svc Industries Inc; Owens Illinois Inc; Quigley Co Inc; Rapid Ameircan Corp; Riley Stoker Corp; Union Carbide Corp; Weil Mc Clain Co Inc; Viacom Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • FWOP; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: EXPERT WITNESS LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF EVELYN FLETCHER DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of; Event Type: Event; Comments: CHRSITOPHER COLLINGS ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERT. OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: DAVID M HAWTHORNE ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
170 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2003
  • Notice of Adoption of Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2003
  • Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2003
  • Notice of Adoption of Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 8:45AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less