This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/25/2019 at 00:42:27 (UTC).

MOWERY, JAMES L VS AMERICAN OOPTICAL CORP

Case Summary

On 03/27/2003 MOWERY, JAMES L filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against AMERICAN OOPTICAL CORP. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOWERY, JAMES L

MOWERY, LINDA LEE WIFE

Defendants

AMERICAN OOPTICAL CORP

AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE USA INC

A W CHESTERTON CO

BIGHAM INSULATION & SUPPLY CO

BIRD INC

CERTAINTEED COR

C E THURSTON & SONS INC

CLEAVER BROOKS INC

CONGOLEUM CORP

CROWN CORK & SEAL CO INC

DANA CORP

DURO DYNE CORP

EASTERN REFRACTOREIS CO INC

EAFCO INC

ERICCSON INC

EXXONMOBIL OIL CORP

FLINTKOTE CO THE

FLOWSERVE CORP

31 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAGOLINZER, DAVID

Ferraro & Assoc. #700 4000 Ponce De Leon Blvd

Miami, F1 33146

Defendant Attorneys

Turner, Hugh J., Jr

CLARK, TIMOTHY

Santangelo, Carolina

ROBERT V FITZSIMMONS

Suite A-145 9485 Sunset Drive

Miami, FL 33173

FITZSIMMONS, ROBERT V.

Other Attorneys

COLLINGS, CHRISTOPHER JAMES MORE

2 South Biscayne Blvdsuite 1500

Miami, FL 33131

KIBBE, REBECCA C

VIRGINIA EASLEY JOHNSON

Foley & Mansfield P L L P 4770 Bisc Blvd - #1030

Miami, FL 33137

MARTIN B UNGER

701 Peachtree Road

Orlando, FL 32804

SMITH, MELVILLE S

Cole, Susan Jane

Grey, Kaylin S

Johnson, Virginia Easley

Stella Chu (esq)

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing-

05/15/2015 - Notice of Hearing-

Amended Answer

05/15/2015 - Amended Answer

Notice of Appearance

05/11/2015 - Notice of Appearance

Notice:

04/30/2015 - Notice:

Notice:

04/30/2015 - Notice:

Notice of Filing:

04/29/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

04/28/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/28/2015 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/24/2015 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/24/2015 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/23/2015 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice:

04/17/2015 - Notice:

Notice of Appearance

04/13/2015 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

04/10/2015 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

04/02/2015 - Notice of Appearance

Order Setting the Initial Case Management Conference

04/01/2015 - Order Setting the Initial Case Management Conference

Notice of Compliance

02/12/2015 - Notice of Compliance

Voluntary Dismissal

06/24/2005 - Voluntary Dismissal

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: SHORTENING TIME TO RESPOND TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: DIRECTING DEFTS TO COMPLETE AUTHORIZATIONS PROVIDED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 29625:4943; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Rhone Poulenc Ag Co Inc; Rhone Poulenc Inc; Union Carbide Agrigultural Produects Inc; Amchem Products Inc; Benjamin Foster Co; Durametallic Corp; Garlock Inc; Bcs Corp; Westinghouse Elect Corp; American Ooptical Corp; Aventis Cropscience Usa Inc; A W Chesterton Co; Bigham Insulation & Supply Co; Bird Inc; Certainteed Cor; C E Thurston & Sons Inc; Cleaver Brooks Inc; Congoleum Corp; Crown Cork & Seal Co Inc; Dana Corp; Duro Dyne Corp; Eastern Refractoreis Co Inc; Eafco Inc; Ericcson Inc; Exxonmobil Oil Corp; Flintkote Co The; Flowserve Corp; Foster Wheeler; Garlock Sealing Technology; Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co The; H B Smith Co Inc; Hobart Brothers Co; John Crane Inc; Kelly Moore Paint Co; Lake Asbestos Of Quebec (ltd); Lincoln Elect Co; Maremont Corp; Metropolitan Life Ins Co; National Svc Industries Inc; Owens Illinois Inc; Pftzer Inc; Quigley Co Inc; Rapid American Corp; Riley Stoker Corp; Union Carbide Corp; Weil Mcclain Co Inc; Viacom Inc; Ametek Inc; Champlain Cable Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 05/22/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: VERIFIED UPDATED OBJECTIONS & ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
185 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2003
  • Notice of Adoption of Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2003
  • Notice of Adoption of Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2003
  • Notice of Adoption; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less