This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/25/2019 at 01:14:15 (UTC).

LANGE, RAYMOND E VS AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP

Case Summary

On 03/27/2003 LANGE, RAYMOND E filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANGE, RAYMOND E

Defendants

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP

AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE USA INC

A W CHESTERTON CO

BIGHAM INSULATION & SUPPLY CO

BIRD INC

CERTAINTEED CORP

C E THURSTON & SONS INC

CLEAVER BROOKS INC

CONGOLEUM CORP

CROWN CORK & SEAL CO INC

DANA CORP

DURO DYNE CORP

EASTERN REFRACTORIES CO INC

EAFCO INC

ERICCSON INC

EXXONMOBIL OIL CORP

FLINTKOTE CO THE

FLOWSERVE CORP

FOSTER WHEELER

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JAGOLINZER, DAVID

Ferraro & Assoc. #700 4000 Ponce De Leon Blvd

Miami, F1 33146

SMITH, MELVILLE S

Holt, Michael R

Defendant Attorneys

Turner, Hugh J., Jr

CLARK, TIMOTHY

Santangelo, Carolina

ROBERT V FITZSIMMONS

Suite A-145 9485 Sunset Drive

Miami, FL 33173

FITZSIMMONS, ROBERT V.

COLLINGS, CHRISTOPHER JAMES MORE

2 South Biscayne Blvdsuite 1500

Miami, FL 33131

Other Attorneys

KIBBE, REBECCA C

VIRGINIA EASLEY JOHNSON

Foley & Mansfield P L L P 4770 Bisc Blvd - #1030

Miami, FL 33137

MARTIN B UNGER

701 Peachtree Road

Orlando, FL 32804

Cole, Susan Jane

Gregory, Boulos

Johnson, Virginia Easley

 

Court Documents

Witness List

06/15/2015 - Witness List

Witness List

06/15/2015 - Witness List

Notice of Appearance

05/13/2015 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

05/12/2015 - Notice of Appearance

Notice:

05/08/2015 - Notice:

Answer and Affirmative Defense

05/05/2015 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/30/2015 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Amended Answer

04/30/2015 - Amended Answer

Notice of Filing:

04/29/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Affidavit of:

04/28/2015 - Affidavit of:

Recorded Document

04/27/2015 - Recorded Document

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/24/2015 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/23/2015 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice:

04/22/2015 - Notice:

Notice of Appearance

04/15/2015 - Notice of Appearance

Order Granting Showing of Good Cause (FWOP Calendar)

04/28/2014 - Order Granting Showing of Good Cause (FWOP Calendar)

FWOP Notice

01/11/2014 - FWOP Notice

Recorded Document

06/27/2005 - Recorded Document

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2015
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 29693:3306; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Rhone Poulenc Ag Co Inc; Rhone Poulenc Inc; Unin Carbide Agrigultural Products Inc; Amchem Products Inc; Benjamin Foster Co; Durametallic Corp; Garlock Inc; Bcs Corp; Westinghouse Elect Corp; American Optical Corp; Aventis Cropscience Usa Inc; A W Chesterton Co; Bigham Insulation & Supply Co; Bird Inc; Certainteed Corp; C E Thurston & Sons Inc; Cleaver Brooks Inc; Congoleum Corp; Crown Cork & Seal Co Inc; Dana Corp; Duro Dyne Corp; Eastern Refractories Co Inc; Eafco Inc; Ericcson Inc; Exxonmobil Oil Corp; Flintkote Co The; Flowserve Corp; Foster Wheeler; Garlock Sealing Technology; Goodyear Tire &rubber Co The; H B Smith Co Inc; Hobrt Brothers Co; John Crane Inc; Kelly Moore Paint Co; Lake Asbestos Of Quebec (ltd); Lincoln Elect Co; Maremont Corp; Metropolitan Life Ins Co; National Svc Industries Inc; Owens Illinois Inc; Pftzer Inc; Quigley Co Inc; Rapid American Corp; Riley Stoker Corp; Union Carbide Corp; Weil Mcclain Co Inc; Viacom Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Witness List; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 07/06/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR PARTIAL RELIEF FROM THE TRIAL ORDER TO EXTEND CERTAIN DEADLINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • FWOP; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Witness List; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Witness List; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Witness List; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Witness List; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
256 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2003
  • Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2003
  • Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2003
  • Notice of Adoption of Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 2:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less