This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/25/2019 at 00:44:58 (UTC).

KUCHKA, HARRY L (JR) VS AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP

Case Summary

On 03/27/2003 KUCHKA, HARRY L JR filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KUCHKA, HARRY L JR

KUCHKA, KATHY JR WIFE

Defendants

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP

AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE U S A INC

A W CHESTERTON CO

BIGHAM INSULATION & SUPPLY CO

BIRD INC

CERTAINTEED CORP

C E THURSTON & SONS INC

CLEAVER BROOKS INC

CONGOLEUM CORP

CROWN CORK & SEAL CO INC

DANA CORP

DURO DYNE CORP

EASTERN REFRACTORIES CO INC

EAFCO INC

ERICCSON INC

EXXONMOBIL OIL CORP

FLINTKOTE CO

FLOWSERVE CORP

29 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAGOLINZER, DAVID

Ferraro & Assoc. #700 4000 Ponce De Leon Blvd

Miami, F1 33146

Defendant Attorneys

Turner, Hugh J., Jr

SANTANGELO, CAROLINA

CLARK, TIMOTHY

ROBERT V FITZSIMMONS

Suite A-145 9485 Sunset Drive

Miami, FL 33173

FITZSIMMONS, ROBERT V.

Other Attorneys

COLLINGS, CHRISTOPHER JAMES MORE

2 South Biscayne Blvdsuite 1500

Miami, FL 33131

SMITH, MELVILLE S

VIRGINIA EASLEY JOHNSON

Foley & Mansfield P L L P 4770 Bisc Blvd - #1030

Miami, FL 33137

MARTIN B UNGER

701 Peachtree Road

Orlando, FL 32804

Ferraro, James L

Cole, Susan Jane

Johnson, Virginia Easley

Evelyn M Fletcher

Kibbe, Rebecca C

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing:

08/07/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Recorded Document

07/30/2015 - Recorded Document

Notice:

06/15/2015 - Notice:

Witness List

06/12/2015 - Witness List

Response to Request for Production

05/20/2015 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Appearance

05/08/2015 - Notice of Appearance

Affidavit of:

05/01/2015 - Affidavit of:

Notice of Filing:

04/30/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

04/30/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

04/29/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

04/28/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/24/2015 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/23/2015 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice:

04/17/2015 - Notice:

Notice of Appearance

04/15/2015 - Notice of Appearance

Voluntary Dismissal

02/26/2015 - Voluntary Dismissal

FWOP Notice

12/11/2014 - FWOP Notice

Voluntary Dismissal

06/19/2006 - Voluntary Dismissal

147 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2016
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 30363:3962; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Weil Mcclain Co Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 29763:1361; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Jagolinzer David; Collings Christopher James More; Smith Melville S; Turner Hugh J. Jr; Martin B Unger; Clark Timothy; Cole Susan Jane; Fitzsimmons Robert V.; Johnson Virginia Easley; Santangelo Carolina; Ferraro James L; Rhone Poulenc Ag Co Inc; Rhone Poulenc Inc; Union Carbide Agrigultural Products Inc; Amchem Products Inc; Benjamin Foster Co; Durametallic Corp; Garlock Inc; Cbs Corp; Westinghouse Elect Corp; American Optical Corp; Aventis Cropscience U S A Inc; A W Chesterton Co; Bigham Insulation & Supply Co; Bird Inc; Certainteed Corp; C E Thurston & Sons Inc; Cleaver Brooks Inc; Congoleum Corp; Crown Cork & Seal Co Inc; Dana Corp; Duro Dyne Corp; Eastern Refractories Co Inc; Eafco Inc; Ericcson Inc; Exxonmobil Oil Corp; Flintkote Co; Flowserve Corp; Foster Wheeler; Garlock Sealing Tech; Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co; H B Smith Co Inc; Hobart Brothers Co; John Crane Inc; Kelly Moore Paint Co; Lake Asbestos Of Quebec Ltd; Lincoln Elect Co; Maremont Corp; Metropolitan Life In

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 29738:1013; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Cancellation Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Cancellation Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 08/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO AMEND

    Read MoreRead Less
257 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2003
  • Notice of Adoption of Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2003
  • Notice of Adoption of Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2011
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 2:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less