This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/25/2019 at 00:45:18 (UTC).

GRABINSKI, RICHARD J VS AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP

Case Summary

On 03/27/2003 GRABINSKI, RICHARD J filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRABINSKI, RICHARD J

Defendants

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP

AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE USA INC

A W CHESTERTON CO

BIGHAM INSULATION & SUPPLY CO

BIRD INC

CERTAOMTEED CPRP

C E THURSTON & SONS INC

CLEAVER BROOKS INC

CONGOLEUM CORP

CROWN CORK & SEAL CO INC

DANA CORP

DURO DYNE CORP

EASTERN REFRACTORIES CO INC

EAFCO INC

ERICCSON INC

EXXONMOBIL OIL CORP

FLINTKOTE CO THE

FLOWSERVE CORP

FOSTER WHEELER

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JAGOLINZER, DAVID

Ferraro & Assoc. #700 4000 Ponce De Leon Blvd

Miami, F1 33146

KIBBE, REBECCA C

Evelyn M Fletcher

Defendant Attorneys

Turner, Hugh J., Jr

CLARK, TIMOTHY

Santangelo, Carolina

ROBERT V FITZSIMMONS

Suite A-145 9485 Sunset Drive

Miami, FL 33173

FITZSIMMONS, ROBERT V.

COLLINGS, CHRISTOPHER JAMES MORE

2 South Biscayne Blvdsuite 1500

Miami, FL 33131

Other Attorneys

VIRGINIA EASLEY JOHNSON

Foley & Mansfield P L L P 4770 Bisc Blvd - #1030

Miami, FL 33137

MARTIN B UNGER

701 Peachtree Road

Orlando, FL 32804

SMITH, MELVILLE S

Cole, Susan Jane

Johnson, Virginia Easley

 

Court Documents

Cancellation Notice

08/12/2015 - Cancellation Notice

Notice of Hearing-

08/11/2015 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice:

08/11/2015 - Notice:

Notice of Filing:

08/07/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Motion:

08/07/2015 - Motion:

Voluntary Dismissal

08/07/2015 - Voluntary Dismissal

Motion:

07/31/2015 - Motion:

Notice of Filing:

05/15/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Appearance

05/12/2015 - Notice of Appearance

Notice:

04/30/2015 - Notice:

Notice:

04/30/2015 - Notice:

Notice of Filing:

04/29/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

04/28/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Affidavit of:

04/28/2015 - Affidavit of:

Notice of Filing:

04/28/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Appearance

04/13/2015 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Compliance

12/05/2013 - Notice of Compliance

Voluntary Dismissal

11/06/2003 - Voluntary Dismissal

165 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 29763:1415; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Jagolinzer David; Collings Christopher James More; Smith Melville S; Turner Hugh J. Jr; Martin B Unger; Clark Timothy; Cole Susan Jane; Fitzsimmons Robert V.; Johnson Virginia Easley; Kibbe Rebecca C; Rhone Poulenc Ag Co Inc; Rhone Poulenc Inc; Union Carbide Agrigultural Products Inc; Amchem Products Inc; Benjamin Foster Co; Durametallic Corp; Garlock Inc; Bcs Corp; Westinghuse Electric Corp; American Optical Corp; Aventis Cropscience Usa Inc; A W Chesterton Co; Bigham Insulation & Supply Co; Bird Inc; Certaomteed Cprp; C E Thurston & Sons Inc; Cleaver Brooks Inc; Congoleum Corp; Crown Cork & Seal Co Inc; Dana Corp; Duro Dyne Corp; Eastern Refractories Co Inc; Eafco Inc; Ericcson Inc; Exxonmobil Oil Corp; Flintkote Co The; Flowserve Corp; Foster Wheeler; Garlock Sealing Technology; Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co The; H B Smith Co Inc; Hobart Brothrs Co; John Crane Inc; Kelly Moore Paint Co; Lake Asbestos Of Quebec (ltd); Lincoln Elect Co; Maremont Corp; Metropolitan Life Ins Co; N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Cancellation Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Cancellation Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Cancellation Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 08/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO AMEND ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF ADOPTION/JOINDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF ADOPTION/JOINDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
290 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2003
  • Notice of Adoption of Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2003
  • Notice of Adoption of Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2003
  • Notice of Adoption of Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less