This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/25/2019 at 00:42:09 (UTC).

DONOVAN, WILLIAM C (SR) VS AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP

Case Summary

On 03/27/2003 DONOVAN, WILLIAM C SR filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DONOVAN, WILLIAM C SR

Defendants

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP

AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE USA INC

A W CHESTERTON CO

BIGHAM INSULATION & SUPPLY CO

BIRD INC

CERTAINTEED CORP

C E THURSTON & SONS INC

CLEAVER BROOKS INC

CONGOLUEM CORP

CROWN CORK & SEAL CO INC

DANA CORP

DURO DYNE CORP

EASTERN REFRACTORIES CO INC

EAFCO INC

ERICCSON INC

EXXONMOBIL OIL CORP

FLINTKOTE CO THE

FLOWSERVE CORP

FOSTER WHEELER

29 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAGOLINZER, DAVID

Defendant Attorneys

Turner, Hugh J., Jr

CLARK, TIMOTHY

Santangelo, Carolina

ROBERT V FITZSIMMONS

Suite A-145 9485 Sunset Drive

Miami, FL 33173

FITZSIMMONS, ROBERT V.

COLLINGS, CHRISTOPHER JAMES MORE

2 South Biscayne Blvdsuite 1500

Miami, FL 33131

Other Attorneys

KIBBE, REBECCA C

VIRGINIA EASLEY JOHNSON

Foley & Mansfield P L L P 4770 Bisc Blvd - #1030

Miami, FL 33137

SMITH, MELVILLE S

Cole, Susan Jane

Johnson, Virginia Easley

Stella Chu (esq)

 

Court Documents

Notice:

06/15/2015 - Notice:

Voluntary Dismissal

05/20/2015 - Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Appearance

05/08/2015 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Filing:

05/04/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

05/01/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Affidavit of:

04/30/2015 - Affidavit of:

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/30/2015 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/30/2015 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Amended Answer

04/30/2015 - Amended Answer

Notice:

04/29/2015 - Notice:

Notice of Filing:

04/28/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/27/2015 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Appearance

04/13/2015 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

04/09/2015 - Notice of Appearance

Notice:

04/07/2015 - Notice:

Notice of Appearance

03/31/2015 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Trial (case at Issue)

02/26/2015 - Notice of Trial (case at Issue)

FWOP Notice

11/16/2013 - FWOP Notice

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 29763:2216; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Jagolinzer David; Collings Christopher James More; Smith Melville S; Turner Hugh J. Jr; Clark Timothy; Cole Susan Jane; Fitzsimmons Robert V.; Johnson Virginia Easley; Kibbe Rebecca C; Rhone Poulenc Ag Co Inc; Rhone Poulenc Inc; Unin Carbide Agrigultural Products Inc; Amchem Products Inc; Benjamin Foster Co; Durametallic Corp; Garlock Inc; Bcs Corp; Westinghouse Elect Corp; American Optical Corp; Aventis Cropscience Usa Inc; A W Chesterton Co; Bigham Insulation & Supply Co; Bird Inc; Certainteed Corp; C E Thurston & Sons Inc; Cleaver Brooks Inc; Congoluem Corp; Crown Cork & Seal Co Inc; Dana Corp; Duro Dyne Corp; Eastern Refractories Co Inc; Eafco Inc; Ericcson Inc; Exxonmobil Oil Corp; Flintkote Co The; Flowserve Corp; Foster Wheeler; Garlock Sealing Technology; Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co; H B Smith Co Inc; Hobart Brothers Co; John Crane Inc; Kelly Moore Paint Co; Lake Asbestos Of Quebec (ltd); Lincoln Elect Co; Maremont Corp; Metropolitan Life Ins Co; National Svc Industrie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: DESIGNATION OF FACT AND EXPERT WITNESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: SHORTENING TIME TO RESPOND TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • FWOP; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 29625:4951; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
171 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2003
  • Notice of Adoption of Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2003
  • Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND STRIKE PLTFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2003
  • Notice of Adoption of Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 8:45AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less