This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/25/2019 at 00:45:38 (UTC).

BORTLIK, JOTHAM D VS AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP

Case Summary

On 03/27/2003 BORTLIK, JOTHAM D filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BORTLIK, JOTHAM D

BORTLIK, PATRICIA WIFE

Defendants

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP

AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE USA INC

A W CHESTERTON CO

BIGHAM INSULATION & SUPPLY CO

BIRD INC

CERTAINTEED CORP

C E THURSTON & SONS INC

CLEAVER BROOKS INC

CONGOLEUM CORP

CROWN CORK & SEAL CO INC

DANA CORP

DURO DYNE CORP

EASTERN REFRACTORIES CO INC

EAFCO INC

ERICCSON INC

EXXONMOBIL OIL CORP

FLINTKOTE CO THE

FLOWSERVE CORP

29 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JAGOLINZER, DAVID

Ferraro & Assoc. #700 4000 Ponce De Leon Blvd

Miami, F1 33146

Kibbe, Rebecca C

Defendant Attorneys

Hawthorne, David M.

SANTANGELO, CAROLINA

CLARK, TIMOTHY

ROBERT V FITZSIMMONS

Suite A-145 9485 Sunset Drive

Miami, FL 33173

FITZSIMMONS, ROBERT V.

Other Attorneys

COLLINGS, CHRISTOPHER JAMES MORE

2 South Biscayne Blvdsuite 1500

Miami, FL 33131

SMITH, MELVILLE S

VIRGINIA EASLEY JOHNSON (ESQ)

Ste 1030 4770 Biscayne Blvd

Miami, FL 33137

JOHNSON, VIRGINIA EASLEY

4770 Biscayne Blvd

Miami, FL 33137

MARTIN B UNGER

701 Peachtree Road

Orlando, FL 32804

Cole, Susan Jane

Stella Chu (esq)

 

Court Documents

Motion in Limine

08/07/2015 - Motion in Limine

Notice of Filing:

08/03/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Witness List

07/29/2015 - Witness List

Memorandum of Law

07/23/2015 - Memorandum of Law

Voluntary Dismissal

07/21/2015 - Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Filing:

07/07/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Witness List

06/15/2015 - Witness List

Witness List

06/12/2015 - Witness List

Notice of Filing:

05/15/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Appearance

05/08/2015 - Notice of Appearance

Amended Answer

04/30/2015 - Amended Answer

Notice:

04/27/2015 - Notice:

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/24/2015 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Voluntary Dismissal

04/24/2015 - Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Appearance

04/14/2015 - Notice of Appearance

Notice:

04/07/2015 - Notice:

Notice:

04/01/2015 - Notice:

Order Granting Showing of Good Cause (FWOP Calendar)

01/09/2014 - Order Granting Showing of Good Cause (FWOP Calendar)

145 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2016
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 30363:3791; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Weil Mcclain Co Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 29894:3449; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Eafco Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Recorded Document; Book/Page: 29783:2731; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE OF VOL DISMISSAL AS TO KAISER GYPSUM CO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 29763:1430; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Jagolinzer David; Collings Christopher James More; Smith Melville S; Martin B Unger; Clark Timothy; Cole Susan Jane; Fitzsimmons Robert V.; Johnson Virginia Easley; Hawthorne David M.; Santangelo Carolina; Rhone Poulenc Ag Co Inc; Rhone Poulenc Inc; Union Carbide Agrigultural Products Inc; Amchem Products Iinc; Benjamin Foster Co; Durametallic Corp; Garlock Inc; Bcs Corp; Westinghouse Electric; American Optical Corp; Aventis Cropscience Usa Inc; A W Chesterton Co; Bigham Insulation & Supply Co; Bird Inc; Certainteed Corp; C E Thurston & Sons Inc; Cleaver Brooks Inc; Congoleum Corp; Crown Cork & Seal Co Inc; Dana Corp; Duro Dyne Corp; Eastern Refractories Co Inc; Eafco Inc; Ericcson Inc; Exxonmobil Oil Corp; Flintkote Co The; Flowserve Corp; Foster Wheeler; Garlock Sealing Technology; Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co The; H B Smith Co Inc; Hobart Brothers Co; John Crane Inc; Kelly Moore Paint Co; Lake Asbestos Of Quebec (ltd); Lincoln Electric Co; Maremont Corp; Metropolitan Life In

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Cancellation Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Cancellation Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Recorded Document; Book/Page: 29735:4122; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE OF VOL DISMISSAL AS TO MOBIL CORP/MOBIL OIL CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
274 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2003
  • Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2003
  • Notice of Adoption of Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2003
  • Notice of Adoption of Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less