This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/25/2019 at 01:14:56 (UTC).

BESCHTA, ROBERT R VS AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP

Case Summary

On 03/27/2003 BESCHTA, ROBERT R filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BESCHTA, ROBERT R

BESCHTA, BEVERLY WIFE

Defendants

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP

AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE U S A INC

A W CHESTERTON CO

BIGHAM INSULATION & SUPPLY CO

BIRD INC

CERTAINTEED CORP

C E THURSTON & SONS INC

CLEAVER BROOKS INC

CONGOLEUM CORP

CROWN CORK & SEAL CO INC

DANA CORP

DURO DYNE CORP

EASTERN REFRACTORIES CO IN

EAFCO INC

ERICCSON INC

EXXONMOBIL OIL CO

FLINTKOTE CO

FLOWSERVE CORP

29 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JAGOLINZER, DAVID

Ferraro & Assoc. #700 4000 Ponce De Leon Blvd

Miami, F1 33146

KIBBE, REBECCA C

Defendant Attorneys

COLLINGS, CHRISTOPHER JAMES MORE

2 South Biscayne Blvdsuite 1500

Miami, FL 33131

Hawthorne, David M.

Santangelo, Carolina

CLARK, TIMOTHY

ROBERT V FITZSIMMONS

Suite A-145 9485 Sunset Drive

Miami, FL 33173

FITZSIMMONS, ROBERT V.

ALLEY, TODD C

Other Attorneys

VIRGINIA EASLEY JOHNSON

Foley & Mansfield P L L P 4770 Bisc Blvd - #1030

Miami, FL 33137

MARTIN B UNGER

701 Peachtree Road

Orlando, FL 32804

SMITH, MELVILLE S

Cole, Susan Jane

Johnson, Virginia Easley

Evelyn M Fletcher

 

Court Documents

Notice:

07/31/2015 - Notice:

Notice of Hearing-

06/29/2015 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion:

06/19/2015 - Motion:

Witness List

06/15/2015 - Witness List

Order:

06/11/2015 - Order:

Notice of Filing:

05/28/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Response to Request for Production

05/20/2015 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Filing:

05/08/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

04/30/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Notice:

04/30/2015 - Notice:

Notice:

04/30/2015 - Notice:

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/23/2015 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/22/2015 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice:

04/17/2015 - Notice:

Notice of Appearance

04/15/2015 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

04/14/2015 - Notice of Appearance

Order Granting Showing of Good Cause (FWOP Calendar)

04/10/2015 - Order Granting Showing of Good Cause (FWOP Calendar)

Notice of Appearance

04/02/2015 - Notice of Appearance

123 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.); Book/Page: 30707:356; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Collings Christopher James More; Smith Melville S; Martin B Unger; Clark Timothy; Fitzsimmons Robert V.; Johnson Virginia Easley; Kibbe Rebecca C; Santangelo Carolina; Alley Todd C; Rhone Poulen Ag Co Inc; Rhone Poulenc Inc; Union Carbide Agrigultural Products Inc; Amchem Products Inc; Benjamin Foster Co; Durametallic Corp; Garlock Inc; Cbs Corp; Westinghouse Elect Corp; American Optical Corp; Aventis Cropscience U S A Inc; A W Chesterton Co; Bigham Insulation & Supply Co; Bird Inc; Certainteed Corp; C E Thurston & Sons Inc; Cleaver Brooks Inc; Congoleum Corp; Crown Cork & Seal Co Inc; Dana Corp; Duro Dyne Corp; Eastern Refractories Co In; Eafco Inc; Ericcson Inc; Exxonmobil Oil Co; Flintkote Co; Flowserve Corp; Foster Wheeler; Garlock Sealing Tech; Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co; H B Smith Inc; Hobart Brothers Co; John Crane Inc; Kelly Moore Paint Co Inc; Lake Asbestos Of Quebec Ltd; Lincoln Elect Co; Maremont Corp; Metropolitan Life Ins Co; National Svc Ind Inc; Owens Illinois I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • FWOP; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 30702:3682; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Returned Mail; Event Type: Event; Comments: CAROLINA SANTANGELO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Returned Mail; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Returned Mail; Event Type: Event; Comments: MARTIN B UNGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 30202:2604; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Riley Stoker Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
225 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2003
  • Notice of Adoption of Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2003
  • Notice of Adoption of Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • Hearing Info: FWOP; Hearing Code: FWOP; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less