This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/20/2019 at 14:07:43 (UTC).

YANCEY, MARK VS HARRISON, ALESHA

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 YANCEY, MARK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HARRISON, ALESHA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YANCEY, MARK

Defendant

HARRISON, ALESHA

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

04/10/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT

04/09/2019:CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT

PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

03/29/2019:PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

03/29/2019:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

03/29/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR ALESHA HARRISON

03/24/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR ALESHA HARRISON

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

03/14/2019:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- PROCESS SERVER/ EMAIL

03/14/2019:SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- PROCESS SERVER/ EMAIL

EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

03/14/2019:EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

RESIDENTIAL LEASE

03/14/2019:RESIDENTIAL LEASE

EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

03/14/2019:EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

03/14/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR ALESHA HARRISON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT-FILING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- PROCESS SERVER/ EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESIDENTIAL LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Payment received: $202.00 Receipt Number XX 411144

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Case 422019SC001217SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 03/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less