This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 09/11/2020 at 21:31:43 (UTC).

WIMBERLY, ALTHA VS JOHNSON, JAMES

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 WIMBERLY, ALTHA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOHNSON, JAMES. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMPSON, THOMAS P III and THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WIMBERLY, ALTHA

Defendant

JOHNSON, JAMES

Not Classified By Court

DBA BIG DADDY CAR WASH,

 

Court Documents

PETITION/COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

08/18/2020:PETITION/COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

EVICTION NOTICE-7 DAYS

08/18/2020:EVICTION NOTICE-7 DAYS

EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

08/18/2020:EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET PROCESS SERVER AND REGULAR MAIL

08/18/2020:SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET PROCESS SERVER AND REGULAR MAIL

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

08/18/2020:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/18/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON JAMES JOHNSON

08/24/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON JAMES JOHNSON

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

08/31/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

08/31/2020:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

08/31/2020:PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING

09/09/2020:NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

09/17/2020:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

JUDGES WORKSHEET

09/15/2020:JUDGES WORKSHEET

CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

09/15/2020:CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED ON DEFT JAMES JOHNSON

09/21/2020:WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED ON DEFT JAMES JOHNSON

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON JAMES JOHNSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketActive Process CIVIL SUMMONS disposition on 08/21/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT-FILING FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE INFORMATION SHEET PROCESS SERVER AND REGULAR MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION NOTICE-7 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $204.00 Receipt Number XX 556688

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketAssessment 4 assessed at sum $2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCase 422020SC002685SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 08/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less