This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/16/2019 at 22:30:57 (UTC).

WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSO VS COOPER, RENE LEA Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSO filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against COOPER, RENE LEA. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSO

Defendants

COOPER, RENE LEA

UNKNOWN PARTY 1

KINGSLAND COUNTRY PROPERTY OWN

UNKNOWN PARTY 4

UNKNOWN PARTY 3

UNKNOWN PARTY 2

Not Classified By Court

NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

COOPER, RENE

LEHMAN XS TRUST MORTGAGE PASS

CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005 6

SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE TO CITIBANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRYGLEWICZ, NATHAN PAUL

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

03/23/2022:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE FILED BY BUYER AVSHALOM PERETZ

03/16/2022:NOTICE OF SERVICE FILED BY BUYER AVSHALOM PERETZ

EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

03/16/2022:EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

03/15/2022:ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/08/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING

CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

03/07/2022:CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

COURT REGISTRY-FULLY DISBURSED

03/04/2022:COURT REGISTRY-FULLY DISBURSED

MOTION-MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY BUYER AVSHALOM PERETZ

03/03/2022:MOTION-MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY BUYER AVSHALOM PERETZ

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY BUYER A VSHALOM PERETZ

03/03/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY BUYER A VSHALOM PERETZ

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $947.50 Receipt Number XX 486057

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $947.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCase 422019CA002563CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less