This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/20/2019 at 22:33:37 (UTC).

WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASS VS ALL PARTIES HAVING OR CLAIMING Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASS filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ALL PARTIES HAVING OR CLAIMING. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HERNDON, LISA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HERNDON, LISA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASS

Defendants

TENANTS INPOSSESSION IF THE AB

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF OTTO E. BEYE

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

ALL PARTIES HAVING OR CLAIMING

BEYER, OTTO E

Not Classified By Court

GRANTEES PERSONAL REPRESENTATI

COMPLAINT

ALIVE AND IF ONE OR MORE OF SA

THEM

DEAD THEIR UNKNOWN SPOUSES HEI

ALL OTHER PAERTIES CLAIMING BY

TITLE OR INTEREST IN THE PROPE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENFELD, TARA LAUREN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/27/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

EFILED LIS PENDENS

03/27/2019:EFILED LIS PENDENS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

03/27/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

03/27/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

03/27/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

03/27/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

03/27/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $945.00 Receipt Number XX 415208

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $945.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketCase 422019CA000680CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 3/27/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less