This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/24/2020 at 22:32:59 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIET VS MITCHELL, DELORIES Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIET filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MITCHELL, DELORIES. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM and HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIET

Defendants

MITCHELL, DELORIES

UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DELORIES MIT

OCALA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

UNKOWN TENANT 2

Not Classified By Court

CO HCA HEALTHCARE

ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK

MORTGAGE BACKED NOTES SERIES 2

FSB AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE FOR T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KISER, AMY MARIE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND

11/23/2020:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

11/23/2020:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DELORIS MITCHELL

11/09/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DELORIS MITCHELL

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT 2

11/09/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT 2

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT 1

11/09/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT DELORIS MITCHELL

11/09/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT DELORIS MITCHELL

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT OCALA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

10/16/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT OCALA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/05/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/05/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT OCALA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $967.50 Receipt Number XX 569146

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $967.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCase 422020CA001577CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/1/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less