This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/01/2022 at 22:33:54 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIET VS GRIGLER, ELLA Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2022 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIET filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GRIGLER, ELLA. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN and ROGERS, STEVEN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN

ROGERS, STEVEN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIET

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES D

GRIGLER, ELLA

TUCKER, BRENDA

TUCKER, EDWARD BERNARD

TUCKER, EARL JR

TUCKER FLORENCE, EARLINE

TUCKER WILLIAMS, SARAH

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FANNIE M TUC

UNKNOWN TENANT

TUCKER, KENNETH LAMAR

TUCKER, KENNETH

UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DE

FSB NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPA

OWNER TRUSTEE OF GAMLT 2017 RP

IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT P

LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND

CLAIM AN INTEREST IN THE ESTAT

AKA FANNIE MAE TUCKER

GRIGLER, ELLA MAE

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATEL, PRATIK R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/07/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

04/07/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

04/07/2022:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

EFILED LIS PENDENS

04/07/2022:EFILED LIS PENDENS

NOTICE OF FILING

04/07/2022:NOTICE OF FILING

EFILED SUMMONS

04/07/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/07/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/07/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/07/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/07/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/07/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/07/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/07/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/07/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/07/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/07/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/12/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $1,030.00 Receipt Number XX 733618

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $1,030.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA000664CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/7/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT P is a litigant

Latest cases where OWNER is a litigant

Latest cases where LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES OR is a litigant

Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant