This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 06/02/2019 at 23:31:06 (UTC).

WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES LL VS WILLIAMS, SHERONTAE VONTRELL V

Case Summary

On 05/09/2019 WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES LL filed an Other lawsuit against WILLIAMS, SHERONTAE VONTRELL V. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES LL

Defendant

WILLIAMS, SHERONTAE VONTRELL V

Not Classified By Court

DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOPEZ, KARLA M

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR SHERONTAE VONTRELL V WILLIAMS

05/21/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR SHERONTAE VONTRELL V WILLIAMS

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/10/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/09/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

EFILED SUMMONS

05/09/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

05/09/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

05/09/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

PETITION/COMPLAINT

05/09/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR SHERONTAE VONTRELL V WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 428693

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Case 422019CC000563CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 5/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less