Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 12/02/2019 at 22:31:24 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INC VS GARRISON, AMANDA Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GARRISON, AMANDA. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INC

Defendants

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

WYKO, KEN

LIFETIME METAL ROOFING INC

GARRISON, AMANDA

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF AMANDA GARRI

Not Classified By Court

DBA LIFETIMNE METAL ROOFING

AKA AMANDA JUNGWIRTH FKA AMAND

TURNER, AMANDA

JUNGWIRTH, AMANDA

AKA AMANDA L TUCKER

TURNER, AMANDA L

SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO WELLS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASSIDY, TAYLOR NICOLE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED KEN WYKO 11.16.19

11/27/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED KEN WYKO 11.16.19

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INC

12/19/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INC

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/10/2020:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

01/10/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

NOTICE

11/08/2019:NOTICE

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

11/08/2019:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

EFILED LIS PENDENS

11/08/2019:EFILED LIS PENDENS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

11/08/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/08/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

ORDER TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT

01/14/2020:ORDER TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT

CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

01/14/2020:CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INC

01/29/2020:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INC

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INC

01/29/2020:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INC

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR LIFETIME METAL ROOFING INC

01/24/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR LIFETIME METAL ROOFING INC

ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING

12/05/2019:ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

11/08/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT LIFETIME METAL ROOFING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $980.00 Receipt Number XX 481807

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $980.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCase 422019CA002457CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR N CASSIDY