This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/15/2019 at 23:06:24 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INC VS CIRACO ELECTRIC INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CIRACO ELECTRIC INC. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INC

Defendants

OAKCREEK CAVERNS LOT OWNERS AS

WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSO

FULLER, JANET L

CIRACO ELECTRIC INC

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPAR

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION

FULLER, JOHN B

Not Classified By Court

DBA OCC POA

SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO WELLS

FKA JANET L KAPLAN,

AKA JANET KAPLAN,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISHMAN, BARRY STUART

 

Court Documents

LENDER INFORMATION SHEET

01/14/2019:LENDER INFORMATION SHEET

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

01/14/2019:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/14/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF FILING

01/14/2019:NOTICE OF FILING

EFILED LIS PENDENS

01/14/2019:EFILED LIS PENDENS

EFILED SUMMONS

01/14/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

01/14/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

01/14/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

01/14/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISC CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OFTHE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT OAKCREEK CAVERNS LOT OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT OAKCREEK COVERNS LOT OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CIRACO ELECTRIC INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR OAKCREEK CAVERNS LOT OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLENDER INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $1,990.00 Receipt Number XX 392082

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $1,990.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketCase 422019CA000098CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 1/14/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FISHMAN, BARRY STUART