Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 12/01/2019 at 22:31:21 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSO VS PERONTO, JAMES E Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSO filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PERONTO, JAMES E. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSO

Defendants

PERONTO, JAMES E

PERONTO, KATHLEEN M

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPT

Not Classified By Court

INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

2007 2 ASSET BACKED CERTIFICAT

PERONTO, J E

AS TRUSTEE FOR OPTION ONE MORT

PERONTO, KATHY M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLARFIELD, STEVEN JAY

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON MOTION-DEFTS' MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER

01/07/2020:ORDER ON MOTION-DEFTS' MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER

ORDER GRANTING MOTION CONT SEE DOC

01/06/2020:ORDER GRANTING MOTION CONT SEE DOC

MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY DEFTS KATHY M. PERONTO AND JAMES E. PERONTO

12/19/2019:MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY DEFTS KATHY M. PERONTO AND JAMES E. PERONTO

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFTS KATHY M. PERONTO AND JAMES E. PERONTO

12/19/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFTS KATHY M. PERONTO AND JAMES E. PERONTO

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFTS KATHY M. PERONTO AND JAMES E. PERONTO

04/06/2020:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFTS KATHY M. PERONTO AND JAMES E. PERONTO

ORDER DENYING DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

03/17/2020:ORDER DENYING DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

CORR/MEMO-MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

02/24/2020:CORR/MEMO-MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

MOTION-MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFTS KATHY M. PERONTO AND JAMES E. PERONTO

01/27/2020:MOTION-MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFTS KATHY M. PERONTO AND JAMES E. PERONTO

MOTION-MOTION TO STRIKE REPLY AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW FILED BY DEFTS

06/17/2020:MOTION-MOTION TO STRIKE REPLY AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW FILED BY DEFTS

NOTICE-NOTICE OF CONSENT TO PLTFS MOTION FILED BY DEFTS KATHY M PERONTO AND JAMES E PERONTO

06/06/2020:NOTICE-NOTICE OF CONSENT TO PLTFS MOTION FILED BY DEFTS KATHY M PERONTO AND JAMES E PERONTO

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFTS KATHY M. PERONTO AND JAMES E. PERONTO

04/06/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFTS KATHY M. PERONTO AND JAMES E. PERONTO

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFTS KATHY M. PERONTO AND JAMES E. PERONTO

04/06/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFTS KATHY M. PERONTO AND JAMES E. PERONTO

NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED AUTHORITY CONT SEE DOC FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK

09/15/2020:NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED AUTHORITY CONT SEE DOC FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK

RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE REPLY FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK

09/15/2020:RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE REPLY FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/13/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER GRANTING MOTION CONT SEE DOC

06/28/2020:ORDER GRANTING MOTION CONT SEE DOC

EFILED LIS PENDENS

11/07/2019:EFILED LIS PENDENS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

11/07/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $935.00 Receipt Number XX 481526

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $935.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketCase 422019CA002451CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/7/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AS TRUSTEE FOR OPTION ONE MORT is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Internal Revenue Service is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clarfield, Steven Jay