This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 01/26/2022 at 21:37:13 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS MESSINA, MIKELYN

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MESSINA, MIKELYN. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMPSON, THOMAS P III, THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III and THOMAS THOMPSON III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III

THOMAS THOMPSON III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

MESSINA, MIKELYN

Ocala, FL 34471-6630

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JACOBSON, ADAM H

NADERPOUR, AMIR

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/03/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

EFILED SUMMONS

01/03/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

NOTICE

01/03/2022:NOTICE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW COMPLAINT

01/03/2022:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW

01/03/2022:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/12/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR MIKELYN MESSINA

01/18/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR MIKELYN MESSINA

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/22/2022 15:00; Judge: THOMPSON, THOMAS P III; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER ELECTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR MIKELYN MESSINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketActive Process PTC disposition on 01/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketEvent SC PTC scheduled on 02/22/2022 at 0300 PM - Judge THOMAS THOMPSON III presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 704191

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCase 422022SC000023SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 1/3/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBSON ADAM H

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMIR NADERPOUR