This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 03/05/2019 at 12:43:28 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS MATTHEWS, REBECCA

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed an Other lawsuit against MATTHEWS, REBECCA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

MATTHEWS, REBECCA

Not Classified By Court

FKA REBECCA E PECCA,

FKA REBECCA PECCA,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NADERPOUR, AMIR

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

06/10/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

06/10/2019:AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

NOTICE OF FILING NOTHING ATTACHED FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

06/27/2019:NOTICE OF FILING NOTHING ATTACHED FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

07/24/2019:CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLENESS OF ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

06/27/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLENESS OF ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

06/10/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

AFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNT DUE FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

06/10/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNT DUE FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

06/10/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

06/10/2019:MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

DEFAULT ENTERED

02/21/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

02/19/2019:AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

02/19/2019:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR REBECCA MATTHEWS

01/14/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR REBECCA MATTHEWS

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PETITION/COMPLAINT

01/02/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

01/02/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

EFILED SUMMONS

01/02/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/02/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR REBECCA MATTHEWS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 388155

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case 422019CC000001CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 1/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less