This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 03/05/2019 at 13:16:25 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS MARKS, STEVEN

Case Summary

On 01/31/2019 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed an Other lawsuit against MARKS, STEVEN. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

MARKS, STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA, HUGO LAZARO

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

04/01/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

04/01/2019:MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

04/01/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK NA

04/01/2019:AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK NA

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

04/01/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

AFFIDAVIT FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

04/01/2019:AFFIDAVIT FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

03/15/2019:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

03/15/2019:AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

DEFAULT ENTERED

03/19/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED

CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

10/23/2019:CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLENESS OF ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

04/12/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLENESS OF ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLENESS OF ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

04/12/2019:NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLENESS OF ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR STEVEN MARKS

02/20/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR STEVEN MARKS

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PETITION/COMPLAINT

01/31/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

01/31/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

01/31/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/31/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR STEVEN MARKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 397389

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Case 422019CC000107CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 1/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less