This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 03/25/2019 at 23:30:12 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS CUDA, HELEN

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed an Other lawsuit against CUDA, HELEN. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

CUDA, HELEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAPTISTE, SABINE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE-STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

06/18/2019:NOTICE-STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

ORDER OF DISMISSAL-AND APPROVING STIPULATION OF PAYMENT PLAN

09/23/2019:ORDER OF DISMISSAL-AND APPROVING STIPULATION OF PAYMENT PLAN

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

10/09/2019:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR HELEN CUDA

04/26/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR HELEN CUDA

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

05/16/2019:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

05/16/2019:AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

DEFAULT ENTERED

05/22/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PETITION/COMPLAINT

03/01/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

03/01/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

EFILED SUMMONS

03/01/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/01/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 407234

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Case 422019CC000237CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 3/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less