This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/03/2023 at 16:31:25 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS CONANT, MATTHEW BERT Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against CONANT, MATTHEW BERT. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MUSLEH, VICTOR JOSEPH, MUSLEH, VICTOR J, SCOTT, EDWARD L and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MUSLEH, VICTOR JOSEPH

MUSLEH, VICTOR J

SCOTT, EDWARD L

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendants

UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEE

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MATTHEW BERT

CONANT, MATTHEW BERT

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROGER WILLIA

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION

CONANT, ROGER WILLIAM

Not Classified By Court

THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE

CREDITORS LIENORS AND TRUSTEES

DECEASED AND ALL OTHER PERSONS

BRIGHTLITE HOMES 1 LLC A NEVAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISHMAN, BARRY STUART

Defendant Attorney

KARYO, MAX RAFAEL

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF POST JUDGMENT ADVANCES AND POST JUDGMENT INTEREST FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

01/07/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF POST JUDGMENT ADVANCES AND POST JUDGMENT INTEREST FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

REGISTRY-PARTIALLY DISBURSED

12/27/2021:REGISTRY-PARTIALLY DISBURSED

CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE TO PLTF ATTORNEY RE DISBURSMENT CHECK

12/22/2021:CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE TO PLTF ATTORNEY RE DISBURSMENT CHECK

CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

12/21/2021:CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED

12/21/2021:CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED

ASSIGNMENT OF BID

12/13/2021:ASSIGNMENT OF BID

CERTIFICATE OF SALE

12/08/2021:CERTIFICATE OF SALE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE

11/08/2021:PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON PLTFS MOTION TO CANCEL SALE AND RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

10/14/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON PLTFS MOTION TO CANCEL SALE AND RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/07/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF POST JUDGMENT ADVANCES AND POST JUDGMENT INTEREST FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2021
View Court Documents

DocketREGISTRY-PARTIALLY DISBURSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE TO PLTF ATTORNEY RE DISBURSMENT CHECK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketASSIGNMENT OF BID

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2021

DocketPayment received: $153,833.32 Receipt Number XX 697482

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2021

DocketAssessment 7 assessed at sum $6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2021

HearingJudge: APPLICABLE, NOT; Docket Type: RESET FCLSR SALE; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER TO BE; Defendant Attorney: KARYO, MAX

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
81 More Docket Entries
11/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/26/2019

DocketPayment received: $970.00 Receipt Number XX 487204

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/26/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $970.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/26/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/26/2019

DocketCase 422019CA002593CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/26/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less