This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 02/21/2022 at 09:25:32 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS BICE, ROBERT J

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed an Other lawsuit against BICE, ROBERT J. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LANDT, ROBERT E and LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LANDT, ROBERT E

LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

BICE, ROBERT J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMSHED, SABERIN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/02/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

12/22/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

12/22/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

12/22/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

AFFIDAVIT FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

12/22/2021:AFFIDAVIT FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLENESS OF ATTORNEYS FEES FIELD BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

12/22/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLENESS OF ATTORNEYS FEES FIELD BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES FIELD BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

12/22/2021:AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES FIELD BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

12/22/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

12/22/2021:MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

DEFAULT ENTERED

11/19/2021:DEFAULT ENTERED

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

11/08/2021:AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

11/08/2021:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ROBERT J BICE

10/18/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ROBERT J BICE

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/07/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE

10/07/2021:NOTICE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW

10/07/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW

EFILED SUMMONS

10/07/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW COMPLAINT

10/07/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLENESS OF ATTORNEYS FEES FIELD BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES FIELD BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 680158

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CC001383CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/7/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jamshed, Saberin