This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/18/2022 at 22:51:28 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK N A VS ANN AMITH, NANCY Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2022 WELLS FARGO BANK N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANN AMITH, NANCY. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK N A

Defendants

RAY SMITH, MARVIN

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARVIN RAY S

ANN AMITH, NANCY

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NANCY ANN SM

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Not Classified By Court

SMITH, MARVIN R

SMITH, MARVIN

AKA MARVIN R SMITH AKA MARVIN

SMITH, NANCY A

SMITH, NANCY

AKA NANCY A SMITH AKA NANCY SM

SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WACHOVI

ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YORK, JULIE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/25/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

10/25/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED LIS PENDENS

10/25/2022:EFILED LIS PENDENS

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

10/25/2022:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

EFILED SUMMONS

10/25/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/25/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/25/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/25/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/25/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

NOTICE OF FILING

10/25/2022:NOTICE OF FILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/26/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/26/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/26/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/26/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/26/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

11/08/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

ORDER GRANTING MOTION PLTFS MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

11/09/2022:ORDER GRANTING MOTION PLTFS MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION PLTFS MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $955.00 Receipt Number XX 792422

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketFiler Selected Confidentiality Flag: . NoConfidentialInformation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $955.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA002240CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less