This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 03/08/2019 at 23:31:47 (UTC).

WEED, AUDREY VS FOOTE, MARION PENNY

Case Summary

On 02/12/2019 WEED, AUDREY filed an Other lawsuit against FOOTE, MARION PENNY. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEED, AUDREY

Defendant

FOOTE, MARION PENNY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMSON, DAVID EARL

Defendant Attorney

COOPER, MICHAEL JORDAN

 

Court Documents

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY COUNTER DEFT AUDREY WEED

03/05/2019:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY COUNTER DEFT AUDREY WEED

COUNTER-CLAIM

02/26/2019:COUNTER-CLAIM

ANSWER

02/26/2019:ANSWER

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY FILED BY DEFT MARION PENNY FOOTE

02/25/2019:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY FILED BY DEFT MARION PENNY FOOTE

AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED BY PLTF AUDREY WEED

02/22/2019:AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED BY PLTF AUDREY WEED

MOTION- MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFT MARION PENNY FOOTE

02/20/2019:MOTION- MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFT MARION PENNY FOOTE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WITH DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAILING ADDRESSES FILED BY DEFT MARION PENNY FOOTE

02/20/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WITH DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAILING ADDRESSES FILED BY DEFT MARION PENNY FOOTE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT MARION PENNY FOOTE SUB SERVICE

02/19/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT MARION PENNY FOOTE SUB SERVICE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/18/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

02/12/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

02/12/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/12/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY COUNTER DEFT AUDREY WEED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COUNTER-CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Payment received: $295.00 Receipt Number XX 405542

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $295.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY FILED BY DEFT MARION PENNY FOOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED BY PLTF AUDREY WEED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFT MARION PENNY FOOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WITH DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAILING ADDRESSES FILED BY DEFT MARION PENNY FOOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT MARION PENNY FOOTE SUB SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 401051

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Case 422019CC000159CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 2/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less