This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/20/2019 at 13:46:30 (UTC).

WANAT, MICHAEL VS RUIZ DEL SOL, CARLOS M Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2019 WANAT, MICHAEL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RUIZ DEL SOL, CARLOS M. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WANAT, MICHAEL

Defendants

RUIZ DEL SOL, CARLOS M

SOSA, AMARILYS

RUIZ DEL SOL, CARLOS MANUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS, REUBEN SHARP

 

Court Documents

CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

04/16/2019:CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR REMOVAL OF TENANT

04/15/2019:CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR REMOVAL OF TENANT

ORDER CANCELLING HEARING

04/12/2019:ORDER CANCELLING HEARING

MOTION- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF MICHAEL WANAT

04/11/2019:MOTION- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF MICHAEL WANAT

DEFAULT ENTERED BY JUDGE

03/29/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED BY JUDGE

CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

03/29/2019:CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING

03/26/2019:ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING

MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF

03/22/2019:MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF

ANSWER/RESPONSE- RESPONSE FILED BY DEFT AMARILYS SOSA

03/14/2019:ANSWER/RESPONSE- RESPONSE FILED BY DEFT AMARILYS SOSA

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR AMARILYS SOSA

03/11/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR AMARILYS SOSA

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CARLOS MANUEL RUIZ DEL SOL

03/11/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CARLOS MANUEL RUIZ DEL SOL

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/07/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/07/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

03/05/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

03/05/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

03/05/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR REMOVAL OF TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER CANCELLING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF MICHAEL WANAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER/RESPONSE- RESPONSE FILED BY DEFT AMARILYS SOSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR AMARILYS SOSA

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 03/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Payment received: $205.00 Receipt Number XX 408499

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Case 422019SC001107SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 3/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less