This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 10/14/2020 at 22:34:20 (UTC).

VOGAN, TIMOTHY VS ANGELES, GEORGE Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 VOGAN, TIMOTHY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANGELES, GEORGE. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCOTT, EDWARD L and SCOTT, EDWARD LEON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCOTT, EDWARD L

SCOTT, EDWARD LEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VOGAN, TIMOTHY

Defendants

TRIAL EXHIBITS INC

ANGELES, GEORGE

Not Classified By Court

A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONSKY, MICHAEL SETH

Defendant Attorney

ZMIJEWSKI, DONNA SUE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLTF TIMOTHY VOGAN

10/12/2020:NOTICE FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLTF TIMOTHY VOGAN

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT GEORGE ANGELES

10/12/2020:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT GEORGE ANGELES

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT TRIAL EXHIBITS INC

10/09/2020:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT TRIAL EXHIBITS INC

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFT TRIAL EXHIBITS INC

10/09/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFT TRIAL EXHIBITS INC

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT TRIAL EXHIBITS INC

10/08/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT TRIAL EXHIBITS INC

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT GEORGE ANGELES

10/08/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT GEORGE ANGELES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT GEORGE ANGELES AND TRIAL EXHIBITS INC

10/08/2020:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT GEORGE ANGELES AND TRIAL EXHIBITS INC

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT TRIAL EXHIBITS INC

10/08/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT TRIAL EXHIBITS INC

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR TRIAL EXHIBITS INC

10/05/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR TRIAL EXHIBITS INC

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/22/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/22/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

09/21/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/21/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/21/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/21/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

EFILED SUMMONS

09/21/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

09/21/2020:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/21/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE-NOTICE FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLTF TIMOTHY VOGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT GEORGE ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT TRIAL EXHIBITS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFT TRIAL EXHIBITS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT TRIAL EXHIBITS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT TRIAL EXHIBITS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT TRIAL EXHIBITS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT GEORGE ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT GEORGE ANGELES AND TRIAL EXHIBITS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT TRIAL EXHIBITS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number XX 566037

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 422020CA001525CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less