This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 09/17/2020 at 21:35:35 (UTC).

VO, KIMTHU VS ORTIZ, JOSE R Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 VO, KIMTHU filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ORTIZ, JOSE R. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMPSON, THOMAS P III and THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VO, KIMTHU

Defendants

ORTIZ, JOSE R

WINSTANLEY, JENNIE

 

Court Documents

PETITION/COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

08/24/2020:PETITION/COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

08/24/2020:EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

RESIDENTIAL LEASE

08/24/2020:RESIDENTIAL LEASE

EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

08/24/2020:EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET EMAIL

08/24/2020:SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET EMAIL

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

08/24/2020:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/24/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/24/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

08/24/2020:CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT JOSE ORTIZ

08/26/2020:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT JOSE ORTIZ

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT JENNIE WINSTANLEY

08/26/2020:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT JENNIE WINSTANLEY

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

09/03/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

09/03/2020:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

09/03/2020:PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING

09/14/2020:NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING

CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION

09/21/2020:CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION

MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

09/25/2020:MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

10/02/2020:MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $1.00 Receipt Number XX 561051

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketAssessment 4 assessed at sum $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketActive Process CIVIL SUMMONS disposition on 08/26/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT JENNIE WINSTANLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT JOSE ORTIZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketActive Process CIVIL SUMMONS disposition on 08/25/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESIDENTIAL LEASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $219.00 Receipt Number XX 558227

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $14.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCase 422020SC002757SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 08/24/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less