This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 10/02/2021 at 23:32:49 (UTC).

VENTURA PARTNERS LLC VS BRITT, COURTNEY Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 VENTURA PARTNERS LLC filed an Other lawsuit against BRITT, COURTNEY. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCCUNE, ROBERT JAMES JR and MCCUNE, R JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCCUNE, ROBERT JAMES JR

MCCUNE, R JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VENTURA PARTNERS LLC

Defendants

BRITT, JUSTIN

BRITT, COURTNEY

Not Classified By Court

A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ISAKSEN, JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PLTF VENTURA PARTNERS LLC

09/24/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PLTF VENTURA PARTNERS LLC

MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLTF VENTURA PARTNERS LLC

09/24/2021:MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLTF VENTURA PARTNERS LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR COURTNEY BRITT

09/24/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR COURTNEY BRITT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JUSTIN BRITT

09/24/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JUSTIN BRITT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

09/20/2021:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFTS JUSTIN BRITT AND COURTNEY BRITT

09/20/2021:ANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFTS JUSTIN BRITT AND COURTNEY BRITT

CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

09/16/2021:CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/10/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/10/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

09/08/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

09/08/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

09/08/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/08/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PLTF VENTURA PARTNERS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLTF VENTURA PARTNERS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR COURTNEY BRITT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JUSTIN BRITT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFTS JUSTIN BRITT AND COURTNEY BRITT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $320.00 Receipt Number XX 671560

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CC001249CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 9/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENTURA PARTNERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ,a Delware Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ISAKSEN, JENNIFER