This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/20/2019 at 02:32:48 (UTC).

VALLEE, REMY VS WHITTEN, JOSHUA

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 VALLEE, REMY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WHITTEN, JOSHUA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT LANDT and LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT LANDT

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALLEE, REMY

Defendant

WHITTEN, JOSHUA

 

Court Documents

JUDGES WORKSHEET

03/19/2019:JUDGES WORKSHEET

CLS: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

03/11/2019:CLS: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED IND. ON JOSHUA WHITTEN

02/21/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED IND. ON JOSHUA WHITTEN

MOTION-MOTION FILED BY PLTF REMY VALLEE

02/19/2019:MOTION-MOTION FILED BY PLTF REMY VALLEE

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

01/29/2019:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/29/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

COPY OF: CORRESPONDENCE AND RECEIPT OF NEW CASE FILED

01/28/2019:COPY OF: CORRESPONDENCE AND RECEIPT OF NEW CASE FILED

CORRESPONDENCE OR MEMORANDUM WITH ATTACHMENTS FILED BY PLTF DR. REMY VALLEE

01/18/2019:CORRESPONDENCE OR MEMORANDUM WITH ATTACHMENTS FILED BY PLTF DR. REMY VALLEE

CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

01/16/2019:CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

01/16/2019:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/15/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Updated Event SC PTC on 03/19/2019 1230 PM - REMOVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLS: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED IND. ON JOSHUA WHITTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Active Process PTC disposition on 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION-MOTION FILED BY PLTF REMY VALLEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT-FILING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Payment received: $17.00 Receipt Number XX 396489

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRESPONDENCE OR MEMORANDUM WITH ATTACHMENTS FILED BY PLTF DR. REMY VALLEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Event SC PTC scheduled on 03/19/2019 at 1230 PM - Judge ROBERT LANDT presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT-FILING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Payment received: $175.00 Receipt Number XX 392787

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Case 422019SC000211SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 01/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Event Date: 03/19/2019 12:30; Judge: LANDT, ROBERT E; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: XX COURTROOM 1A

    Read MoreRead Less