This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/18/2023 at 22:48:30 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIA VS WEEKS, MARVA JOYCE

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WEEKS, MARVA JOYCE. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIA

Defendants

WEEKS, MARVA JOYCE

ALL PARTIES CLAIMING TO HAVE A

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESS

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARVA JOYCE

TIMBERWALK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIAT

Not Classified By Court

WEEKS, MARVA

WEEKS, MARVA J

INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCR

NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

DEFENDANTS ARE ALIVE AND IF ON

DEFENDANTS ARE DEAD THEIR UNKN

DEVISEES GRANTEES PERSONAL REP

CREDITORS AND ALL PARTIES CLAI

OR AGAINST THEM

COMPLAINT

TRUSTEE FOR LB IGLOO SERIES IV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUGGAR, JASON

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

06/07/2023:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS

05/30/2023:AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

05/30/2023:AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN FORECLOSURE FILED BY PLTF US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

05/30/2023:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN FORECLOSURE FILED BY PLTF US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST MARVA JOYCE WEEKS AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARVA JOYCE WEEKS

05/10/2023:DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST MARVA JOYCE WEEKS AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARVA JOYCE WEEKS

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY

05/05/2023:AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

05/05/2023:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

CLERKS CERTIFICATE RE: ROOF OF PUBLICATION FOR NOTICE OF ACTION

02/17/2023:CLERKS CERTIFICATE RE: ROOF OF PUBLICATION FOR NOTICE OF ACTION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION ON NOTICE OF ACTION

02/16/2023:PROOF OF PUBLICATION ON NOTICE OF ACTION

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ON NOTICE OF ACTION

01/24/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ON NOTICE OF ACTION

NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED MAILINGS AND ATTORNEY COPY

01/24/2023:NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED MAILINGS AND ATTORNEY COPY

CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE FILED BY PLTF US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

01/20/2023:CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE FILED BY PLTF US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK

01/10/2023:DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK

AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

01/10/2023:AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFTS FILED BY PTLF US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

01/05/2023:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFTS FILED BY PTLF US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 1

12/23/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE MARVA JOYCE WEEKS

12/23/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE MARVA JOYCE WEEKS

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR MARVA JOYCE WEEKS

12/23/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR MARVA JOYCE WEEKS

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN FORECLOSURE FILED BY PLTF US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST MARVA JOYCE WEEKS AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARVA JOYCE WEEKS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCLERKS CERTIFICATE RE: ROOF OF PUBLICATION FOR NOTICE OF ACTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION ON NOTICE OF ACTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING ON NOTICE OF ACTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
11/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2022

DocketFiler Selected Confidentiality Flag: . NoConfidentialInformation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $955.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2022

DocketCase 422022CA002374CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/10/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less