This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/26/2022 at 22:40:41 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIA VS FULLER, JANET L Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/02/2022 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FULLER, JANET L. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN and ROGERS, STEVEN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN

ROGERS, STEVEN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIA

Defendants

FULLER, JOHN B

FULLER, JANET L

WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK

OAKCREEK CAVERNS LOT OWNERS AS

THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Not Classified By Court

ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF

DEVELOPMENT

NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

TRUSTEE FOR RCF 2 ACQUISITION

CO US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

STARASOLER, TRACY

Defendant Attorney

CALLAWAY, LAWRENCE C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JOHN B FULLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JANET L FULLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFTS JOHN B FULLER AND JANET L FULLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA. STAT. 702.015.4 CERTIFICATION FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $1,955.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA000198CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 2/2/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRUSTEE FOR RCF 2 ACQUISITION is a litigant

Latest cases where CO US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSO is a litigant

Latest cases where ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where DEVELOPMENT LLC is a litigant