This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/15/2022 at 22:38:01 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIA VS ALL PARTIES HAVING OR CLAIMING Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2022 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ALL PARTIES HAVING OR CLAIMING. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIA

Defendants

ALL PARTIES HAVING OR CLAIMING

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CL

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GLENDINA FLO

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

BENJAMIN, GEORGE CHARLES

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GEORGE CHARL

MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

MARION COUNTY CLERK OF THE CIR

FLORES, GLENDINA

Not Classified By Court

TITLE OR INTEREST IN THE PROPE

COMPLAINT

UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN N

DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN T

WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES M

AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRAN

CLAIMANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOWARD, HARRIS SETH

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/24/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/24/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

08/22/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

08/22/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

08/22/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

08/22/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

08/22/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

08/22/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

08/22/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

08/22/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

NOTICE

08/22/2022:NOTICE

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2022

DocketPayment received: $1,002.50 Receipt Number XX 773920

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
08/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $1,002.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2022

DocketCase 422022CA001745CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 8/22/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less