This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/16/2019 at 01:29:10 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS SMITH, BRICE A Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2019 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SMITH, BRICE A. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HERNDON, LISA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HERNDON, LISA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TAMMY K SMIT

SMITH, TAMMY K

SMITH, BRICE A

Not Classified By Court

CORPORATION HOME EQUITY MORTGA

AKA TAMARA KAY SMITH AKA TAMMY

HOME EQUITY MORTGAGE ASSET BAC

CERTIFICATES SERIES 2006 KS7

AKA TAMRA K SMITH,

AKA TAMMY KAY SMITH,

AKA BRICE SMITH AKA BRICE ALLE

AKA TAMMY SMITH AKA TAMRA K SM

AKA TAMARA SMITH,

AKA TAMARA K SMITH,

AKA TAMARA K SMITH AKA TAMARA

AKA TAMARA KAY SMITH,

AKA BRICE SMITH,

PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERI

AKA TAMMY SMITH,

AS TRUSTEE FOR RESIDENTIAL ASS

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLARFIELD, STEVEN JAY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

05/01/2019:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

05/01/2019:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TAMMY K SMITH

04/02/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TAMMY K SMITH

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT TAMMY K SMITH

04/02/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT TAMMY K SMITH

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BRICE A SMITH

04/02/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BRICE A SMITH

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT BRICE A SMITH

04/02/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT BRICE A SMITH

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TAMMY K SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT TAMMY K SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BRICE A SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT BRICE A SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $945.00 Receipt Number XX 412288

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $945.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketCase 422019CA000615CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 3/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERI is a litigant

Latest cases where AS TRUSTEE FOR RESIDENTIAL ACC is a litigant

Latest cases where CERTIFICATES SERIES 2006 KS7 is a litigant