Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 11/06/2019 at 22:05:39 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS MYERS, BRYAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MYERS, BRYAN. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BRYAN MYERS

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

MYERS, BRYAN

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

REGIONS BANK

Not Classified By Court

A FOREIGN CORP AUTHORIZED TO D

MYERS, BRYAN K

AKA BRYAN K MYERS AKA BRIAN MY

MYERS, BRIAN

TRUSTEE FOR THE RMAC TRUST SER

STATE OF FLORIDA

NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETTE, ANGELA MARIA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

08/21/2020:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME CONT SEE DOC FILED BY DEFT REGIONS BANK

12/02/2019:MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME CONT SEE DOC FILED BY DEFT REGIONS BANK

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL

12/09/2019:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT 2

11/27/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT 2

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT BRYAN MYERS

12/02/2019:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT BRYAN MYERS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT REGIONS BANK

11/27/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT REGIONS BANK

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT 1

11/27/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BRYAN MYERS

11/27/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BRYAN MYERS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT WELLS FARGO BANK NA

11/27/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT WELLS FARGO BANK NA

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT WELLS FARGO BANK NA

11/26/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT WELLS FARGO BANK NA

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT BRYAN MYERS

11/27/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT BRYAN MYERS

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/05/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/05/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/05/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/05/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

11/01/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

11/01/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

11/01/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Payment received: $1,967.50 Receipt Number XX 480054

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $1,967.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Case 422019CA002418CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRUSTEE FOR THE RMAC TRUST SER is a litigant

Latest cases where Regions Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant