This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/22/2022 at 22:37:17 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPOR Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPOR. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROGERS, STEVEN G and ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROGERS, STEVEN G

ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPOR

MARION COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY

OGLESBY, EDDIE JOE JR

UNKNOWN PARTY 1

UNKNOWN PARTY 2

UNKNOWN PARTY 3

UNKNOWN PARTY 4

Not Classified By Court

AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE FOR THE C

MORTGAGE BACKED NOTES SERIES 2

ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HO

DEVELOPMENT

COMMUNITY SERVICES DEPARTMENT

THE NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS TO

IN POSSESSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRYGLEWICZ, NATHAN PAUL

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

09/19/2022:ANSWER TO VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

09/08/2022:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

ANSWER TO VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

09/08/2022:ANSWER TO VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

DISCLAIMER BY THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA CONDITIONAL

09/07/2022:DISCLAIMER BY THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA CONDITIONAL

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

08/29/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

08/29/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

08/29/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

08/29/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

08/29/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

08/29/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

08/29/2022:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

EFILED LIS PENDENS

08/29/2022:EFILED LIS PENDENS

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCLAIMER BY THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA CONDITIONAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $467.50 Receipt Number XX 775695

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $467.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA001790CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 8/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less