Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 11/07/2019 at 22:32:13 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPOR Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2019 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPOR. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

UNKNOWN PARTY 4

VELAZQUEZ, LEITHIA S

MEADOW GLENN OF MARION COUNTY

UNKNOWN PARTY 1

FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPOR

SOSA DIAZ, ANEUDY

THE INDEPENDENT SAVINGS PLAN C

UNKNOWN PARTY 3

UNKNOWN PARTY 2

Not Classified By Court

DBA ISPC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORRIS, JESSICA R

Defendant Attorneys

RUSSO, ADAM GARRETT

TROPELLO, BRADFORD JUSTIN

MCGUIRE, CHRISTOPHER DALE

 

Court Documents

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT MEADOW GLENN OF MARION COUNTY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

10/29/2019:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT MEADOW GLENN OF MARION COUNTY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN PARTY 2

10/25/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN PARTY 2

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORP

10/25/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORP

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT MEADOW GLENN OF MARION COUNTY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

10/25/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT MEADOW GLENN OF MARION COUNTY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

10/24/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER FILED BY DEFT THE INDEPENDENT SAVINGS PLAN COMPANY

10/24/2019:ANSWER FILED BY DEFT THE INDEPENDENT SAVINGS PLAN COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT ANEUDY SOSA DIAZ AND LEITHIA A VELAZQUEZ

10/17/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT ANEUDY SOSA DIAZ AND LEITHIA A VELAZQUEZ

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/14/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

EFILED SUMMONS

10/14/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/14/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/14/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

10/14/2019:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

PETITION/COMPLAINT

10/14/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT ANEUDY SOSA DIAZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT MEADOW GLENN OF MARION COUNTY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN PARTY 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN PARTY 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT THE INDEPENDENT SAVINGS PLAN COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT LEITHIA S VELAZQUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT ANEUDY SOSA DIAZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT MEADOW GLENN OF MARION COUNTY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • Payment received: $985.00 Receipt Number XX 474083

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $985.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • Case 422019CA002280CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEADOW GLENN OF MARION COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where ISPC is a litigant

Latest cases where Florida Housing Finance Corp is a litigant