This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/07/2022 at 22:35:24 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS COTMAN, THOMASINA L Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2022 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against COTMAN, THOMASINA L. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN and ROGERS, STEVEN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN

ROGERS, STEVEN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

COTMAN, THOMASINA L

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF THOMASINA L

UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION

ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PARTIES

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

Not Classified By Court

INCLUDING IF A NAMED DEFENDANT

PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES THE S

HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES CREDIT

PARITES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UN

DEFENDANT AND ALL CLAIMANTS PE

NATURAL OR CORPORATE OR WHOSE

IS UNKNOWN CLAIMING UNDER ANY

OR DESCRIBED DEFENDANTS

NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

INDENTURE TRUSTEE FOR THE HOLD

TRUST 2021 R1 MORTGAGE BACKED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSALER, BRIAN LEE

Defendant Attorney

RUSSO, ADAM GARRETT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/14/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

07/14/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/14/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

07/14/2022:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

EFILED LIS PENDENS

07/14/2022:EFILED LIS PENDENS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/14/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/14/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/19/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/19/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFT AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY DEFT THOMASINA COTMAN

07/25/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFT AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY DEFT THOMASINA COTMAN

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFT AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY DEFT THOMASINA COTMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $925.00 Receipt Number XX 762512

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $925.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA001416CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 7/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less