Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 11/06/2019 at 22:04:41 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS CLERK OF COURT OF MARION COUNT Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2019 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CLERK OF COURT OF MARION COUNT. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

CLERK OF COURT OF MARION COUNT

HOLT, MICHAEL OWEN

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL OWEN

HOLT, MICHELLE A

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF

Not Classified By Court

HOLT, MICHELLE

HOLT, MIKE

MORTGAGE BACKED NOTES SERIES 2

HOLT, MIKE O

AKA MICHAEL O HOLT AKA MIKE O

HOLT, MICHAEL O

AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE FOR CIM T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILDMAN, ROSEMARIE ANGELLA

 

Court Documents

MOTION-MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

04/13/2020:MOTION-MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

04/06/2020:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

04/02/2020:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR APRIL 15 2020 FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

03/25/2020:MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR APRIL 15 2020 FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

CLS: ORDER CANCELLING SALE

03/31/2020:CLS: ORDER CANCELLING SALE

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/04/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF

03/04/2020:ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL

03/04/2020:AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

10/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Payment received: $450.00 Receipt Number XX 478937

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Case 422019CA002398CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES is a litigant

Latest cases where AS THE INDENTURE TRUSTEE FOR THE CIM TRUST 2016-1 MORTGAGE BACKED NOTES SERIES 2016-1 is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSEMARIE WILDMAN