Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 11/04/2019 at 22:32:09 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS BLEND, ASHLEY ELIZABETH Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BLEND, ASHLEY ELIZABETH. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

HOWARD, NANCY JEAN

TH A MINOR CHILD BY AND THROUG

HOWARD III, CHARLES T

HOWARD, ERIC JOHN

DH A MINOR CHILD BY AND THROUG

HOWARD, JOSHUA ALLEN

Not Classified By Court

ELIZABETH, ASHLEY

GIBSON, WANDA HOWARD

HOWARD, MARGARET M

AN INDENTURE TRUSTEE FOR CIM T

HOWARD, CHARLES T

CLAIMING INTEREST BY THROUGH U

LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND

HARBIN, NANCY JEAN

GIBSON, WANDA A

GUARDIAN AND MOTHER MARGARET M

HOWARD, WANDA A

HOWARD, NANCY J

ESTATE OF CHARLES HOWARD AKA C

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GONZALEZ, MIGUEL ANTONIO

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT CHARLES T HOWARD

10/28/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT CHARLES T HOWARD

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN HEIRS

10/23/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN HEIRS

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

10/11/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/11/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/11/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/11/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/11/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/11/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/11/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/11/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/11/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/11/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

NOTICE OF FILING

10/11/2019:NOTICE OF FILING

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

10/11/2019:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

EFILED LIS PENDENS

10/11/2019:EFILED LIS PENDENS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

10/11/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/11/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT CHARLES T HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • Payment received: $525.00 Receipt Number XX 473897

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Case 422019CA002271CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES OR is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gonzalez, Miguel Antonio