This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/28/2020 at 09:42:28 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS ARGENT MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/04/2020 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ARGENT MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCOTT, EDWARD L and SCOTT, EDWARD LEON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCOTT, EDWARD L

SCOTT, EDWARD LEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

ARGENT MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DE

BROWN, TEDDY LEE SR

Not Classified By Court

CORPORATION HOME EQUITY MORTGA

BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST TH

PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERI

AS TRUSTEE FOR RESEDENTIAL ASS

LUCY GRAHAM DECEASED

CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTH

SURVIVING SPOUSE GRANTEES ASSI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOLARO, ANDREW ROBERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $945.00 Receipt Number XX 552799

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $945.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCase 422020CA001245CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 8/4/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less