This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/15/2019 at 23:57:22 (UTC).

U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS JOHNSON, CONCETTA Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JOHNSON, CONCETTA. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HERNDON, LISA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HERNDON, LISA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

UNKNOWN PARTY 1

LAKE JOY AND MAGIC LAKE PROPER

JOHNSON, CONCETTA

JOHNSON, LARRY

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRA

UNKNOWN PARTY 2

Not Classified By Court

AKA CONCETTA D JOHNSON,

NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

ASSOCIATION INC

LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES OR

THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST LEROY

INDENTURE TRUSTEE FOR THE CIM

MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADAMS, KERRY

 

Court Documents

EFILED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

09/08/2019:EFILED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION- NOTICE OF SALE

08/29/2019:PROOF OF PUBLICATION- NOTICE OF SALE

EFILED NOTICE OF SALE

08/05/2019:EFILED NOTICE OF SALE

EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

11/01/2019:EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE AND TIME FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

06/14/2019:NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE AND TIME FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

06/14/2019:NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

05/23/2019:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

PROOF OF PUBLICATION-NOTICE OF ACTION

04/11/2019:PROOF OF PUBLICATION-NOTICE OF ACTION

NOTICE-NOTICE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL

06/04/2019:NOTICE-NOTICE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION-NOTICE OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED MAILING/NO ATTORNEY COPY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT NOT ATTACHED FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED NOTICE OF ACTION FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN PARTY 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN PARTY 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR LARRY JOHNSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR LAKE JOY AND MAGIC LAKE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT CONCETTA JOHNSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $972.50 Receipt Number XX 398910

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $972.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketCase 422019CA000277CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 2/5/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES is a litigant

Latest cases where LAKE JOY AND MAGIC LAKE PROPER is a litigant

Latest cases where INDENTURE TRUSTEE FOR THE CIM is a litigant

Latest cases where LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES OR is a litigant