This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 06/17/2019 at 23:30:41 (UTC).

TROY CAPITAL LLC VS DUSTIN, ELISA Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2019 TROY CAPITAL LLC filed an Other lawsuit against DUSTIN, ELISA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TROY CAPITAL LLC

Defendants

DUSTIN, ROBERT

DUSTIN, ELISA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER, JONATHAN ROBERT

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ENTERED

05/05/2020:DEFAULT ENTERED

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS FILED BY PLTF TROY CAPITAL LLC

06/11/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS FILED BY PLTF TROY CAPITAL LLC

CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

06/24/2020:CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

06/24/2020:CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF TROY CAPITAL LLC

06/11/2020:MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF TROY CAPITAL LLC

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF TROY CAPITAL LLC

06/11/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF TROY CAPITAL LLC

EFILED UNSIGNED DEFAULT

10/10/2019:EFILED UNSIGNED DEFAULT

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

10/10/2019:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFT AS TO ELISA DUSTIN FILED BY PLTF TROY CAPITAL LLC

09/16/2019:MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFT AS TO ELISA DUSTIN FILED BY PLTF TROY CAPITAL LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ELISA DUSTIN

09/11/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ELISA DUSTIN

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY AS TO ROBERT DUSTIN FILED BY PLTF TROY CAPITAL LLC

10/10/2019:AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY AS TO ROBERT DUSTIN FILED BY PLTF TROY CAPITAL LLC

ORDER ON PLTFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFT AS TO ELISA DUSTIN

10/07/2019:ORDER ON PLTFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFT AS TO ELISA DUSTIN

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

05/24/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

EFILED SUMMONS

05/24/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

05/24/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/24/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

05/24/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Payment received: $320.00 Receipt Number XX 433360

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Case 422019CC000640CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 5/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less