Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 11/27/2019 at 22:31:33 (UTC).

TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018 VS 21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against 21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018

Defendants

COOK, JAMES L

UNKNOWN PERSON S IN POSSESSION

COOK, WENDY M

21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANITA WINING

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPT

REGIONS BANK

Not Classified By Court

ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANDERGRIFF, LEA W.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JAMES L COOK

12/18/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JAMES L COOK

EFILED SUMMONS

11/04/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

11/04/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

11/04/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

11/04/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

11/04/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

11/04/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

11/04/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

11/04/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING

04/28/2020:NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/03/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME filed by defendant james l cook and wendy m cook

12/30/2019:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME filed by defendant james l cook and wendy m cook

CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE FILED BY PLTF: TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST

01/06/2020:CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE FILED BY PLTF: TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANITA WININGS

12/20/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANITA WININGS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE filed by the defendant james l cook and wendy m cook

12/30/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE filed by the defendant james l cook and wendy m cook

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED BY PLTF TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018 1

12/12/2019:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED BY PLTF TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018 1

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT REGIONS BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT 21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $1,980.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketCase 422019CA002426CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/4/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASSOCIATION, INC., SABAL is a litigant

Latest cases where 21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2017 is a litigant

Latest cases where Regions Bank is a litigant